SC S0378 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 47-3-630 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Penalties For Teasing, Maltreating, And Injuring Police Dogs And Horses, To Provide For Penalties, Restitution, And Community Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police dogs and horses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-25HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-24SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-10SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2021-02-10SenateRead second time
2021-02-09SenateCommittee Amendment Tabled
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
473630(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback