SC S0358 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 38-31-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Application Of The South Carolina Property And Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association, So As To Apply The Provisions Of Chapter 31, Title 38 To A Claim Or Loss Covered By Self-insurance That Occurred Prior To The Acquisition Of A Block Of Business By A Licensed Insurer; And To Amend Section 42-5-20, Relating To Insurance Requirements For Workers' Compensation, So As To Prohibit A Self-insurer From Participating In Or Obtaining Benefits From The South Carolina Property And Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association And To Require The South Carolina Workers' Compensation Commission To Secure An Actuarial Opinion Before Approving The Transfer Of A Self-insurer To A Licensed Insurer. - Ratified Title
Title
Property and casualty insurance guaranty association
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Act No. 5 | |
2019-03-27 | Effective date 07/01/19 | |
2019-03-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Ratified R 10 | |
2019-02-22 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-02-21 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-02-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-21 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3705 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry