SC S0335 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Act No. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Act 596 Of 1969, As Amended, Relating To The Membership Of The Hilton Head No. 1 Public Service District Commission, To Provide For Seven Apportioned Election Districts, And To Provide For The Election Of Candidates In 2024 And 2026. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hilton Head Redistricting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-06 Act No. 93
2023-06-26 Effective date 06/19/23
2023-06-19 Signed By Governor
2023-06-14 Ratified R 93
2023-06-07HouseRead third time and enrolled
2023-05-17HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-2
2023-05-17HouseRead second time
2023-05-16HouseDelegation report: Favorable Beaufort Delegation
2023-04-18HouseReferred to Beaufort Delegation
2023-04-18HouseIntroduced and read first time
2023-04-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2023-03-02SenateRead second time
2023-01-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback