SC S0335 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Change The Commencement Date Of Each Commissioner's Term To January First In The Year Following The Commissioner's Election, To Change The Election Date For Commissioners To The First Tuesday After The First Monday In November And To Provide For Staggered Terms, To Revise The Procedures For Advertising Elections For Commissioners In A Newspaper Of General Circulation, To Require Commission Candidates To File Statements Of Intention Of Candidacy With The Aiken County Board Of Voter Registration And Elections, And To Establish The Filing Period For The Election Of Commissioners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election of the Commissioners of the Bath, Langley, and Clearwater Water and Sewer Districts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10 Act No. 104
2019-03-11 Effective date 03/07/19
2019-03-07HouseVeto overridden Yeas-95 Nays-1
2019-02-27SenateVeto overridden by originating body Ayes-40 Nays-0
2019-02-26 Vetoed by Governor
2019-02-20 Ratified R 4
2019-02-06HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-02-05HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
2019-02-05HouseRead second time
2019-02-01 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
2019-01-30 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-01-29SenateAmended
2019-01-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-10SenateRead second time
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0335&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/335_20190108.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/335_20190108A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/335_20190110.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/335_20190129.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/335_20190130.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/335_20190131.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/335_20190201.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15573
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15749
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15844

Bill Comments

feedback