SC S0327 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-19 - Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-19 - Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Amend Rule 27, Rules Of The Senate, To Provide For A Seventy-two Hour Budget Review.
Title
Seventy-two hour budget review rule
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Adoption Of The Senate Resolution (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-19 | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 | |
2011-01-19 | Adopted | |
2011-01-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-01-18 | Debate interrupted | |
2011-01-18 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted | |
2011-01-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-01-13 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Rules | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced | |
2010-12-15 | Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-12-15 | Prefiled |