SC S0296 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Malicious Injury To A Place Of Worship, To Provide That Whoever Wilfully, Unlawfully, And Maliciously Vandalizes, Defaces, Damages, Or Destroys Or Attempts To Vandalize, Deface, Damage, Or Destroy Any Fixtures Or Improvements Of A Place Of Worship, Or Aids, Agrees With, Employs, Or Conspires With Any Person To Do Or Cause To Be Done Any Of These Acts Is Guilty Of A Felony And, Upon Conviction, Must Be Imprisoned Not Less Than Six Months Nor More Than Ten Years Or Fined Not More Than Ten Thousand Dollars, Or Both.
Title
Vandalism of places of worship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Corbin, Young |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |