SC S0295 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 1, Chapter 1, Title 40 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Board Regulation Of Professions And Occupations, By Adding Section 40-1-75 And Section 40-1-77, To Provide That Professional Boards And Commissions May Not Solely Deny A License Application Based Upon An Applicant's Prior Criminal Conviction Unless The Conviction Is For A Crime That Directly Relates To The Duties And Responsibilities For The Specific Occupation Or Professional License Being Sought, To Provide That Boards And Commissions Must Identify Crimes That Would Lead To An Automatic Disqualification From Licensure, To Provide That An Applicant May Obtain A Determination From The Appropriate Board Or Commission Concerning Whether His Prior Criminal Conviction Is A Disqualifying Conviction, To Provide Notice To Applicants Who Seek Such A Determination, To Provide For Licensure By Boards And Commissions For Applicants Who Complete Certain Apprenticeship Programs, And To Define Necessary Terms.
Title
Board regulation of professions and occupations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |