SC S0285 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 12-6-3791 So As To Allow An Income Tax Credit For Contributions To A Scholarship-funding Organization That Provides Grants For Students To Attend Certain Independent And Home Schools, To Specify The Manner In Which The Credit Is Claimed, To Specify The Process By Which Certain Organizations And Schools Become Eligible, To Specify Certain Information Which Must Be Made Public, And To Allow The State Treasurer And Department Of Revenue To Enforce The Provisions Of The Credit; And To Repeal Section 12-6-3790 Relating To The Educational Credit For Exceptional Needs Children's Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing Academic Choice in Education (PACE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: To Set For Special Order (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2023-03-28HouseIntroduced and read first time
2023-03-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-16SenateRead third time and sent to House
2023-03-15SenateRoll call Ayes-28 Nays-9
2023-03-15SenateRead second time
2023-03-15SenateAmended
2023-03-15SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2023-03-07SenateRoll call Ayes-28 Nays-13
2023-03-07SenateSpecial order, set for March 7, 2023
2023-02-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-02-22SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2023-02-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2022-12-07SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2022-12-07SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1263790(n/a)See Bill Text
1263791(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback