SC S0243 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Act No. 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Act No. 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 63-7-940, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Authorized Uses Of Unfounded Child Abuse And Neglect Reports, So As To Authorize The Release Of Information About Child Fatalities Or Near Fatalities; To Amend Section 63-7-1990, As Amended, Relating To The Confidentiality And Release Of Child Abuse And Neglect Records, So As To Authorize The Release Of Information About Child Fatalities Or Near Fatalities; And To Amend Section 63-7-20, As Amended, Relating To Children's Code Definitional Terms, So As To Add A Definition For "near Fatality". - Ratified Title
Title
Confidential or unfounded child abuse and neglect reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Act No. 224 | |
2022-06-28 | Effective date 06/17/22 | |
2022-06-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-06-16 | Ratified R 253 | |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2022-06-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0 |
2022-06-15 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Young, Shealy, McElveen |
2022-05-12 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Bernstein, Collins, Davis |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2022-05-11 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | House | Amended |
2022-05-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Family and Veterans' Services |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 7 | 1990 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |