SC S0230 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 16-3-2020(g) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Trafficking Victims Who Are Minors, To Provide That Minors Engaged In Commercial Sexual Activity Or Trafficking Are Presumed To Be Doing So Under Coercion Or As The Result Of A Reasonable Fear Of A Threat, To Provide For An Affirmative Defense Of These Victims, And To Provide For Expungement For These Victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trafficking victims, minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateAmended
2021-05-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-05-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-05-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1632020(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback