SC S0228 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Create The Tri-county Technical College Enterprise Campus Authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical College Enterprise Campus Authorities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04 Act No. 2
2019-02-28 Effective date 02/21/19
2019-02-21 Signed By Governor
2019-02-20 Ratified R 3
2019-02-08HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-02-07HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-02-07HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2019-02-07HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-02-06HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 2-7-19
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
2019-01-30SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-01-29SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2019-01-29SenateRead second time
2019-01-23SenateCommittee report: Favorable Education
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3105 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59532410(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback