SC S0221 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Continue The "sentencing Reform Oversight Committee" Until December 31, 2020.
Title
Sentencing Reform Oversight Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-31 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 6-1-16 |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-06-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-0 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Polled out of committee Judiciary |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Campsen, Hembree |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |