SC S0205 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]

Summary

Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge Along Wateree Road In Fairfield County Where It Crosses The Wateree Creek "jerry Nealy Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing These Words.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jerry Nealy Bridge

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04HouseAdopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
2023-05-03HouseCommittee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2023-03-28HouseReferred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2023-03-28HouseIntroduced
2023-03-23SenateAdopted, sent to House
2023-03-22SenateRecalled from Committee on Transportation
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced
2022-11-30SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2022-11-30SenatePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback