SC S0203 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 59-19-60 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Removal Of School District Trustees And Filling Vacancies, To Provide That District Trustees Guilty Of Malfeasance, Misfeasance, Incompetency, Absenteeism, Conflicts Of Interest, Misconduct, Persistent Neglect Of Duty In Office, Or Incapacity Shall Be Subject To Removal From Office By The Governor, To Delete Notice Requirements And The Right To Appeal, And To Make Conforming Changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School district trustees, removal and vacancy filling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-24SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-18SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2021-02-18SenateRead second time
2021-02-18SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591960(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback