SC S0203 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To School Districts, By Adding Section 59-17-45, To Provide Criteria For School District Consolidation, And To Provide For An Exception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School districts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591745(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback