SC S0177 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Covid-19 Vaccinations Are Purely Voluntary, To Provide That An Employer Cannot Take An Adverse Employment Action Against An Employee Who Chooses Not To Undergo A Covid-19 Vaccination, And To Provide That The Department Of Health And Environmental Control Cannot Require Isolation Or Quarantine For A Person Who Chooses Not To Undergo A Covid-19 Vaccination.
Title
COVID-19 vaccinations
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Corbin [R] | Sen. Rex Rice [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] | Sen. Danny Verdin [R] |
Sen. Shane Martin [R] | Sen. Billy Garrett [R] | Sen. Penry Gustafson [R] | Sen. Lawrence Grooms [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-7 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3711 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary