SC S0173 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That One Purpose Of The Program Is To Provide Counseling Services To Officers Experiencing Stress-related Disorders
Title
Law Enforcement Training Council new definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 46 | |
2017-05-25 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 67 | |
2017-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2017-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-3-17 |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, McLeod, Rice, Timmons |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3466 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 23 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 23 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 23 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 3 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |