SC S0162 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating To Penalties For Failure To Register A Motor Vehicle, To Provide That A Person Who Fails To Register A Motor Vehicle Is Guilty Of A Misdemeanor And, Upon Conviction, Shall Be Fined Not More Than Five Hundred Dollars Or Imprisoned For A Period Not To Exceed Thirty Days, Or Both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-14SenateRoll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
2019-03-14SenateRead second time
2019-03-12SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3916 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Act No. 69

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12372615(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback