SC S0156 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Debate adjourned until Wed., 9-23-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 24-3-975 So As To Provide That, Under Certain Circumstances, It Is Unlawful To Possess Within Or Introduce Upon The Grounds Of A Correctional Facility A Telecommunication Device, To Define The Term "telecommunication Device", And To Provide A Penalty For A Violation Of This Provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 9-23-20
2020-02-20HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2020-01-22HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2020-01-15HouseDebate adjourned until Wednesday, January 22
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-07SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-06SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2019-03-06SenateRead second time
2019-03-06SenateAmended
2019-02-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-26SenateCommittee report: Favorable Corrections and Penology
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
243975(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback