SC S0154 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Chapter 54, Title 12 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Uniform Method Of Collection And Enforcement Of Taxes Levied And Assessed By The South Carolina Department Of Revenue, By Adding Section 12-54-20, To Provide That A Taxpayer That Prevails In An Action Or Proceeding To Recover A Tax Or Penalty Is Entitled To Reasonable Attorneys' Fees And Costs Associated With Defending The Action Or Proceeding.
Title
Revenue Department, taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |