SC S0107 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 48-39-280, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The State's Beach Preservation Policy, So As To Apply Certain Exceptions To The Establishment Of A Baseline For Coastal Erosion Zones And To Remove The Study Requirement In Cases Where Primary Oceanfront Sand Dunes Do Not Exist. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beach preservation policy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Act No. 41
2021-06-01 Effective date 05/17/21
2021-05-17 Signed By Governor
2021-05-13 Ratified R 54
2021-05-05HouseRead third time and enrolled
2021-05-04HouseRoll call Yeas-117 Nays-0
2021-05-04HouseRead second time
2021-04-29HouseDebate adjourned
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-09SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-02-04SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4839280(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback