SC S0076 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Act No. 138
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 48-52-870, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Energy Efficient Manufactured Homes Incentive Program, So As To Extend The Program Five Additional Years; To Amend Section 12-36-2110, Relating To The Maximum Sales Tax, So As To Extend A Provision Related To Energy Efficient Manufactured Homes, And To Amend Act 80 Of 2013, Relating To The High Growth Small Business Job Creation Act, So As To Reauthorize The Act For An Additional Six Years. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy efficient manufactured homes incentive program; extend the program for five years

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-12 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number Rfh-1 (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28 Act No. 138
2020-05-26 Signed By Governor
2020-05-21 Ratified R 143
2020-05-12SenateOrdered enrolled for ratification
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2020-05-12SenateFree conference report received and adopted
2020-05-12SenateFree conference committee appointed Cromer, Scott, Corbin
2020-05-12SenateFree conference powers granted
2020-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-2
2020-05-12HouseFree conference report adopted
2020-05-12HouseFree conference committee appointed Clemmons, Stavrinakis, DC Moss
2020-05-12HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-3
2020-05-12HouseFree conference powers granted
2020-03-11SenateConference committee appointed Cromer., Scott and Corbin
2020-03-11HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Clemmons, Stavrinakis, DC Moss
2020-03-10SenateRoll call Ayes-0 Nays-41
2020-03-10SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-96 Nays-5
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseAmended
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-01-23SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-01-22SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
2019-01-22SenateRead second time
2019-01-16SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12362110(n/a)See Bill Text
4852870(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0076&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/76_20181212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/76_20190116.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/76_20190502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/76_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/76_20200512.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15503
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16750
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16791
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17583
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17711
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17676
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17720

Bill Comments

feedback