SC S0040 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-6-21
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 5-29-30 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Right Of Municipalities To Establish On-street Parking Facilities, To Provide That Municipalities May Not Establish Or Alter Parking Facilities On Any State Highway Facility Without The Prior Approval Of The Department Of Transportation; To Amend Section 57-5-840 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Alterations By A Municipality Of State Highway Facilities, To Provide That Restrictions On The Use Of State Highway Facilities By A Municipality Are Subject To Prior Approval By The Department Of Transportation; To Amend Article 5, Chapter 5, Title 57 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Construction Of The State Highway System, By Adding Section 57-5-845, To Provide That Parking On State Highway Facilities Located On Barrier Islands Is Free And Any Restrictions May Only Be Made By The Department Of Transportation; To Amend Section 57-7-210 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Obstructions In Highways, To Provide That The Fine For Violations Is Calculated On A Per-day Basis; To Amend Section 57-7-220 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Removal Of Obstructions In Highways, To Provide That Obstructions On Any Portion Of A Public Highway Must Be Removed As Soon As Possible By The Governmental Entity Responsible For Maintaining The Highway; And To Define Necessary Terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State highways

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 5-6-21
2021-04-28HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-06SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-04-01 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-31SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2021-03-31SenateRead second time
2021-03-31SenateAmended
2021-02-03SenateCommittee report: Favorable Transportation
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52930(n/a)See Bill Text
575840(n/a)See Bill Text
575845(n/a)See Bill Text
577210(n/a)See Bill Text
577220(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0040&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/40_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/40_20210203.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/40_20210331.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/40_20210401.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/40_20210422.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0040%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0040%202021-04-06%20updated.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0040%202021-03-31%20amended.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19018

Bill Comments 750

feedback