SC S0038 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "reinforcing College Education On America's Constitutional Heritage Act" Or The "reach Act"; To Amend Section 59-29-120, Relating To The Study Of The United States Constitution Required For Graduation, So As To Provide Public High Schools Shall Provide Instruction Concerning The United States Constitution, The Declaration Of Independence, The Emancipation Proclamation, And The Federalist Papers To Each Student For At Least One Year; To Amend Section 59-29-130, Relating To The Duration Of Instruction In The Essentials Of The United States Constitution, So As To Provide Public Institutions Of Higher Learning Shall Require Students To Complete At Least Three Credit Hours Of Instruction That Provides A Comprehensive Overview Of The Major Events And Turning Points Of American History And Government, To Include Specific Requirements For Such Instruction, To Provide Public Institutions Of Higher Learning May Not Grant Certificates Of Graduation For Baccalaureate Degree Programs To Students Who Fail To Successfully Complete This Instruction Requirement, To Provide Exemptions, To Provide Related Implementation Requirements Of The Governing Boards Of Public Institutions Of Higher Learning, To Provide Related Oversight And Compliance Reporting Requirements Of The Commission Of Higher Education, And To Specify The Students To Which These Provisions Apply; To Repeal Section 59-29-140 Relating To The Enforcement Of The Program Of Study Of The United States Constitution By The State Superintendent Of Education; And To Make The Provisions Of This Act Effective Beginning With The 2021-2022 School Year. - Ratified Title
Title
Reinforcing College Education on America's Constitutional Heritage Act (REACH Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Act No. 26 | |
2021-04-30 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2021-04-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-28 | Ratified R 38 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2021-04-20 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2021-04-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-12 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read second time |
2021-04-15 | House | Amended |
2021-04-14 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-15-21 |
2021-04-14 | House | Amended |
2021-04-13 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-14-21 |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-02-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3338 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Magnuson
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 29 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 29 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 29 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |