SC S0035 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "reinforcing College Education On America's Constitutional Heritage Act" Or The "reach Act", To Amend Section 59-29-120(a), Relating To The Study Of The United States Constitution Requisite For Graduation, To Provide That Each Public High School Must Provide Instruction Concerning The United States Constitution, The Federalist Papers, And The Declaration Of Independence To Each Student For At Least One Year; To Amend Section 59-29-130, Relating To The Duration Of Instruction In The Essentials Of The United States Constitution, To Provide That Each Institution Of Higher Learning Must Provide Instruction Concerning The United States Constitution, The Federalist Papers, And The Declaration Of Independence To Each Undergraduate Student For Three Semester Credit Hours; And To Repeal Section 59-29-140, Relating To The Enforcement Of The Program Of Study Of The United States Constitution By The State Superintendent Of Education.
Title
Reinforcing College Education on America's Constitutional Heritage Act or REACH Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number P4 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number P2 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Amendment Number P2 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-02-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-29 Nays-7 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Amended |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2019-01-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4296 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 29 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 29 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 29 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |