SC S0031 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize May 12, 2019, As "myalgic Encephalomyelitis Awareness Day" And The Month Of May, Annually, As "myalgic Encephalomyelitis Awareness Month" In South Carolina In Order To Help Spread Awareness Of The Disease And The Need For Increased Research Funding And To Support Individuals Living With Myalgic Encephalomyelitis.
Title
Myalgic Encephalomyelitis Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-03-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Polled out of committee Medical Affairs |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |