SC S0028 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 56-1-286 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Suspension Of A License Or Permit Or Denial Of Issuance Of A License Or Permit To Persons Under The Age Of Twenty-one Who Drive Motor Vehicles And Have A Certain Amount Of Alcohol Concentration, To Allow A Person Under The Age Of Twenty-one Who Is Serving A Suspension Or Denial Of A License Or Permit To Enroll In The Ignition Interlock Device Program; To Amend Section 56-1-385(a) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Reinstatement Of A Permanently Revoked Driver's License, To Limit Its Application To Offenses Occurring Prior To October 1, 2014; To Amend Section 56-1-400 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Surrender Of A License And Endorsing Suspension And Ignition Interlock Device On A License, To Remove The Requirement That A Person Seeking To Have A License Issued Must First Provide Proof That Any Fine Owed Has Been Paid, And To Include A Reference To The Habitual Offender Statute; To Amend Section 56-1-1090(a) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Requests For Restoration Of The Privilege To Operate A Motor Vehicle, To Allow A Person Classified As A Habitual Offender To Obtain A Driver's License With An Interlock Restriction If He Participates In The Ignition Interlock Device Program; To Amend Section 56-1-1320(a) Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Provisional Drivers' Licenses, To Eliminate Provisional Licenses For First Offense Driving Under The Influence Unless The Offense Occurred Prior To The Effective Date Of This Act; To Amend Section 56-1-1340 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Issuance Of Licenses And Convictions To Be Recorded, To Conform Internal Statutory References; To Amend Section 56-5-2941 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Ignition Interlock Devices, To Include A Reference To The Habitual Offender Statute, Remove Exceptions To Ignition Interlock Devices For Offenders Who Are Nonresidents And First-time Offenders Of Driving Under The Influence Who Did Not Refuse To Submit To Chemical Tests And Had An Alcohol Concentration Of Fifteen One-hundredths Of One Percent Or More, Require Device Manufacturers Pay Certification Fees Associated With Ignition Interlock Devices, Permit Those Drivers With Permanently Revoked Licenses After October 2014 To Seek Relief After Five Years, And Make The Records Of The Ignition Interlock Devices The Records Of The Department Of Probation, Parole And Pardon Services; To Amend Section 56-5-2951 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Temporary Alcohol Licenses, To Require An Ignition Interlock Device Restriction On A Temporary Alcohol License And To Delete Provisions Relating To Route-restricted Licenses; And To Amend Section 56-5-2990 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Suspension Of A Convicted Person's Driver's License And The Period Of Suspension, To Require An Ignition Interlock Device If A First-time Offender Of Driving Under The Influence Seeks To End A Suspension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license; suspended due to DUI

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3008 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5611090(n/a)See Bill Text
5611320(n/a)See Bill Text
5611340(n/a)See Bill Text
561286(n/a)See Bill Text
561385(n/a)See Bill Text
561400(n/a)See Bill Text
5652941(n/a)See Bill Text
5652951(n/a)See Bill Text
5652990(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback