SC S0017 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extend Certain Government Approvals Affecting Economic Development Within The State.
Title
Economic development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2022-06-15 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Talley, Climer, Sabb |
2022-05-11 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Willis, Jordan, Wheeler |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-1 |
2022-05-05 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-05 | House | Amended |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-02-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Sabb, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |