SC S0007 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To Provide For A Proportional Reduction In The Transfer Of Recording Fees In The Annual Appropriations Act Under Certain Circumstances; And To Amend Act 200 Of 2002, Relating To The Establishment And Funding Sources Of The South Carolina Conservation Bank, To Extend For Ten Years, Through June 30, 2028, The Provisions Of Chapter 59, Title 48, The South Carolina Conservation Bank Act, Otherwise Scheduled For Repeal Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
S.C. Conservation Bank Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0007&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/7_20161213.htm |