SC H5420 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Place Signs At The Intersection Of Crowfield Boulevard And United States Highway 176, And At The Intersection Of Crowfield Boulevard And College Park Road In Berkeley County That Contain The Words "home Of The Stratford High School Lady Knights, The 2016 Aaaa State Softball Champions".
Title
Home of the Stratford High School Lady Knights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2016-05-31 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-05-25 | House | Introduced |