SC H5365 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 12-6-40, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Application Of The Internal Revenue Code To State Income Tax Laws, So As To Update The Reference To The Internal Revenue Code To The Year 2019 And To Provide That If The Internal Revenue Code Sections Adopted By This State Are Extended, Then These Sections Also Are Extended For South Carolina Income Tax Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IRS Code

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-03-09HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S1152 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Act No. 16

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12640(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback