SC H5308 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Sangaree Parkway In Berkeley County From Its Intersection With United States Highway 17a/north Main Street To Its Intersection With Easement Lane "wade Arnette Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Wade Arnette Highway
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. Marvin Smith [R] | Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] | Rep. JA Moore [D] |
Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2022-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-05-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-28 | House | Introduced |