SC H5305 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Act No. 143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establish Covid-19 Voting-related Procedures For The 2020 General Election; To Authorize Absentee Voting For All Qualified Electors Residing Or Voting In An Area Subject To A Declared State Of Emergency; To Establish A Timeline For The Receipt Of Completed Absentee Ballot Applications; To Delineate How Qualified Electors May Submit Completed Absentee Ballots To The County Board Of Voter Registration And Elections; To Establish A Start Date For In-office Absentee Voting; To Establish A Timeline For The Examination Of Return-addressed Envelopes And The Tabulation Of Absentee Ballots; To Require That Certain Information Be Included In The Public Notice Required Pursuant To Section 7-13-35; To Require The State Election Commission To Develop Recommendations To Reduce The Spread Of Covid-19 During The 2020 General Election; To Require The State Election Commission To Develop A Voter Education Program; And To Provide The Provisions Of This Act Shall Apply Only To The 2020 General Election And The Processes Necessary To Finalize The Results. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballots

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-15 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House: Table Amendment 2a Amendment Number 2a (Y: 73 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House: Table Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 76 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23 Act No. 143
2020-09-23 Effective date 09/16/2020
2020-09-16 Signed By Governor
2020-09-16 Ratified R 149
2020-09-15HouseRoll call Yeas-93 Nays-1
2020-09-15HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2020-09-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-09-03SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-09-02SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-09-02SenateRoll call Ayes-xxx Nays-xxx
2020-09-02SenateRead second time
2020-09-02SenateAmended
2020-03-12SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-10SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-05HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-03-04HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2020-03-04HouseRead second time
2020-03-03HouseDelegation report: Favorable Lancaster Delegation
2020-02-27HouseReferred to Lancaster Delegation
2020-02-27HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
71335(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback