SC H5211 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge That Crosses The Saluda River Along Hollywood School Road In Saluda County "harmon Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At The Bridge Containing These Words.
Title
Harmon Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-05-04 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced |