SC H5150 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Change The Date To July 1, 2019.
Title
Alcohol dealer license
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-4-18 |
2018-03-22 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-3-18 |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary