SC H5137 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-11)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 8-11-150 So As To Provide Twelve Weeks Of Paid Family Leave For State Employees Due To The Birth, Adoption, Or Foster Care Of A Son Or Daughter.
Title
Family leave; provide twelve weeks of paid leave for state employees due to birth, adoption or foster care of child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2020-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk, Cobb-Hunter, Brawley, Thigpen, Stavrinakis, Rutherford, Pope, Jordan, Johnson, Moore, Henderson-Myers, McDaniel, Pendarvis, Elliott, B.Newton, Anderson, Hosey, Clyburn, Dillard, Robinson, Mack, Gilliard, Herbkersman, Norrell, Wheeler, Ridgeway, W.Newton, Henegan, Govan |
2020-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins, King |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0997 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=5137&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/5137_20200212.htm |