SC H5126 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 378 In Horry County From Its Intersection With United States Highway 501 To Its Intersection With El Bethel Road "lois Eargle Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing This Designation.
Title
Lois Eargle Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-04-03 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced |