SC H5119 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That State Guard Members May Receive A Daily Stipend Or Per Diem Pay For Reasonable Expenses, Or Both, If Approved By The Adjutant General.
Title
State Guard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Amended |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-28 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2016-04-27 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-26 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 6 | 1140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 635 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |