SC H5109 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-13-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-13-20
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 23-23-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Certification Of A Law Enforcement Officer Employed Or Appointed By A Public Law Enforcement Agency, So As To Provide A Noncertified Law Enforcement Officer Shall Only Perform His Duties As A Law Enforcement Officer While Accompanied By A Certified Law Enforcement Officer, And To Make A Technical Change.
Title
Law enforcement officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-13-20 |
2020-05-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams |
2020-04-08 | House | Debate adjourned |
2020-03-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2020-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, McCravy, McDaniel, Tallon, Gagnon, Ridgeway, Hixon, Gilliam, Jones, Yow, Rutherford |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |