SC H5090 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: West
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide After July 1, 2020, A Person May Not Be Elected Or Appointed To A Judicial Office That Is Filled By Election Or Appointment Of The General Assembly If That Person Is An Immediate Family Member Of A Sitting Member Of The General Assembly, Or A Former Member Of The General Assembly Whose Most Recent Term Of Legislative Service Ended Less Than One Year Prior To The General Assembly's Election Or Appointment Of The Office In Question.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: West
2020-02-12HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Herbkersman
2020-02-05HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Hixon, Wheeler, R.Williams, Parks, Ridgeway, Thigpen
2020-02-04HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Cogswell, W.Cox, Davis
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-04HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0270 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21105(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback