SC H5081 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, Sottile, Gilliam, Pope, Forrest
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, Sottile, Gilliam, Pope, Forrest
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Amendment To Section 36, Article Iii Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To The General Reserve Fund, So As To Provide That The General Reserve Fund Of Five Percent Of General Fund Revenue Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year Must Be Increased Each Year By One-half Of One Percent Of The General Fund Revenue Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year Until It Equals Seven Percent Of Such Revenues; And Proposing An Amendment To Section 36, Article Iii Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Also Relating To The Capital Reserve Fund So As To Provide That The Capital Reserve Fund Of Two Percent Of General Fund Revenue Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year Must Be Increased To Three Percent Of General Fund Revenue Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year.
Title
General Reserve Fund and Capital Reserve Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, Sottile, Gilliam, Pope, Forrest |
2020-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, McCravy, West, Thayer, Erickson, Bradley, Huggins, Collins |
2020-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White, Hyde, Ligon, Elliott, Fry, Gagnon |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced and read first time |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=5081&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/5081_20200130.htm |