SC H5079 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 7-7-110, Relating To Designation Of Voting Precincts In Beaufort County, So As To Redesignate The Map Number On Which These Precincts Are Delineated. - Ratified Title
Title
Beaufort County Precincts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 155 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/13/24 | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 171 | |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-02-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2024-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |