SC H5069 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 9 In The Town Of Cheraw In Chesterfield County From Its Intersection With Town And Country Road To Its Intersection With Windsor Drive "dr. Joseph Kershaw Newsom Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Dr. Joseph K. Newsom Memorial Hwy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2022-05-12 | House | Concurred in amendment |
2022-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Amended and adopted |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-04-20 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced |