SC H5062 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 50-9-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Hunting And Fishing Licenses, So As To Authorize The Department Of Natural Resources To Offer A License, Permit, Or Tag Made Of A Durable Material And To Establish A Fee.
Title
Hunting and fishing licenses; authorize DNR to offer license, permit or tag made of a durable material and establish fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-02-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-1 |
2020-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Amended |
2020-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |