SC H5017 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kilmartin
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kilmartin
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 6-29-550 So As To Require A County To Report A Residential Development Plan To A City Under Certain Circumstances; By Amending Section 5-3-90, Relating To Filing Notice With The Secretary Of State, Department Of Transportation, And Department Of Public Safety, So As To Require Notice To The County Where Property To Be Annexed Is Located; By Amending Section 6-1-920, Relating To Definitions, So As To Modify Definitions; By Amending Section 6-1-930, Relating To Developmental Impact Fees, So As To Provide That System Improvement Costs Do Not Include Repair, Operation, Or Maintenance Of Existing Or New Capital Improvements Or Administrative And Operating Costs Of The Related Governmental Entity; By Amending Section 6-1-960, Relating To The Recommended Capital Improvements Plan, So As To Modify The Circulation And Preparation Requirements Of The Plan; And By Amending Section 6-1-1020, Relating To Refunds Of Impact Fees, So As To Provide That Impact Fees That Have Not Been Expended Within Seven Years Of The Date They Were Scheduled To Be Expended Must Be Refunded To The Owner Of Record Of Property On Which A Development Impact Fee Has Been Paid.
Title
Development Impact Fee
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Wooten [R] | Rep. Jermaine Johnson [D] | Rep. Neal Collins [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] |
Rep. Davey Hiott [R] | Rep. William Sandifer [R] | Rep. Jay Kilmartin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kilmartin |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0983 (Similar To) 2024-01-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4891 (Similar To) 2024-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Connell
H4891 (Similar To) 2024-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, Connell
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 3 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 1020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 930 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 960 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 29 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=5017&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/5017_20240201.htm |