SC H4999 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 199
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 199
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-56-200 Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Hazardous Waste Cleanup, So As To Provide Standards For Conducting Certain Cleanup, Removal, Remediation, Or Other Responses; To Provide Site-specific Remediation Standards; And To Define Necessary Terms. - Ratified Title
Title
Hazardous waste cleanup
Sponsors
Rep. Davey Hiott [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 199 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/22 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 225 | |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Amended |
2022-04-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0603 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs