SC H4946 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 12-36-2125 So As To Place Certain Conditions On The Manner In Which Eligibility For Certain Sales Tax Exemptions Are Determined.
Title
SC Agricultural Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Haddon [R] | Rep. Randy Ligon [R] | Rep. Josiah Magnuson [R] | Rep. James Burns [R] |
Rep. Cally Forrest [R] | Rep. Stewart Jones [R] | Rep. Richard Yow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-8-22 |
2022-03-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Thurs., 3-3-22 |
2022-03-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-2-22 |
2022-02-24 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-1-22 |
2022-02-23 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-24-22 |
2022-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2022-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |