SC H4944 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 7-7-490, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Spartanburg County, So As To Add Two Precincts, To Eliminate Two Precincts, And To Update The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting precincts, Spartanburg County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Act No. 130
2020-03-26 Effective date 03/15/20
2020-03-24 Signed By Governor
2020-03-19 Ratified R 135
2020-03-03HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2020-03-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2020-02-20SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2020-02-20SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-02-06SenateRead second time
2020-02-06SenateAmended
2020-01-23SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-21SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-21SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-01-17HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-01-16HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-01-16HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
2020-01-16HouseRead second time
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77490(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback