SC H4879 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Continued
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Create The "student Flexibility In Education Scholarship Fund", To Provide For Funding, To Provide For Qualifications, And To Provide For The Administration Of The Program.
Title
Student Flexibility in Education Scholarship Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Continued |
2022-05-10 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-05-04 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-04-27 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-04-06 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-30 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2022-03-10 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-09 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon, Daning |
2022-03-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Thurs., 3-3-22 |
2022-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bradley, Taylor |
2022-02-15 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2022-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, McGarry |
2022-02-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox, White |
2022-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |