SC H4878 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Communications Between A Public Safety Employee Or The Employee's Immediate Family And Certain Critical Incident Support Service Providers Shall Be Confidential And Privileged Under Certain Circumstances
Title
Confidential communication
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Act No. 234 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date 06/03/16 | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 271 | |
2016-06-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2016-06-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-06-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hembree (ch), Corbin, McElveen |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-0 |
2016-03-16 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-16 | House | Amended |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |